Capital Budgets

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - RenovationChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0162
    (SB0186 / CH0009)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017SpeakerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsCapital Budget (B5)
HB0170
    (SB0188)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation ProjectsDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0597
    (SB0417)
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary WarDelegate PattersonIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0682
    (SB0438)
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - EstablishedDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0186 / CH0009
    (HB0162)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Budget and TaxationAppropriationsCapital Budget (B5)
SB0188
    (HB0170)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation ProjectsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0417
    (HB0597)
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary WarSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0438
    (HB0682)
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - EstablishedSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 1:47 P.M.