Caroline County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162 / CH0192
    (SB0148 / CH0191)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesCaroline County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0290
    (SB0147)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0147
    (HB0290)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0148 / CH0191
    (HB0162 / CH0192)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.