Carroll County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0298Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' MarketsCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0300Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer Festival LicensesDelegate KrebsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0305 / CH0469
    (SB0429 / CH0468)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0307Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student EnrollmentCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0310
    (SB0430)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0319 / CH0467
    (SB0428 / CH0466)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student RepresentativeCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0543 / CH0618Carroll County - Deer Hunting - SundaysCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0846
    (SB0588 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0978 / CH0396Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival PermitDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1533Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation BoardDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0428 / CH0466
    (HB0319 / CH0467)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student RepresentativeCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0429 / CH0468
    (HB0305 / CH0469)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0430
    (HB0310)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0588 / CH0063
    (HB0846)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0848Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0855Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - ProhibitedSenator GettyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0940Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary MonumentsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Generally (L1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.