Charles County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007 / CH0346Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - ModificationsDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0172 / CH0085Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of SaleCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0173Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart ZonesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0995
    (SB0868)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building AdditionCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0997
    (SB0867)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0159Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Charles County - Mattawoman Creek Art CenterSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0586 / CH0292
    (HB1019 / CH0293)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0866Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the ArtsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0867
    (HB0997)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0868
    (HB0995)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building AdditionSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.