Chartered Counties

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0129Staggered Election Terms - Charter County CouncilsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0243
    (SB0166)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0352 / CH0261Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System AuditsDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0663
    (SB0580)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0736Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - EstablishmentDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1316 / CH0308Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery LicensesDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0166
    (HB0243)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0580
    (HB0663)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0779Land Use - Proposed Development Project - Transit and Traffic Adequacy StudiesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.