Chemical Tests

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0303 / CH0365Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead PoisoningDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0351 / CH0101State Athletic Commission - Amateur Mixed Martial Arts and Amateur Kick Boxing - Licensing and RegulationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0754Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Qualified OfferDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1067Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1490Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - ProhibitionDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0114Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B TestingSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0850
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0959
    (HB0765)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0989Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug TestingSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1070
    (HB1475)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.