Chemical Tests

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0115 / CH0221
    (SB0721)
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0430 / CH0247Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se OffensesDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0532Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory TestsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0615Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0657 / CH0447
    (SB0346)
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of DrugsDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0819Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0978 / CH0112HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - ModificationDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0346
    (HB0657 / CH0447)
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of DrugsSenator PughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0605Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator RaskinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0672
    (HB0992)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0721
    (HB0115 / CH0221)
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.