Chemical Tests

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0047Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0180 / CH0441
    (SB0856 / CH0440)
Public Health - HIV Testing During PregnancyDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Health (J1)
HB0182Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0269Pretrial Release, Parole, and Probation - Marijuana - UrinalysesDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0372Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - PenaltiesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0399 / CH0451
    (SB0926 / CH0450)
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required NoticeDelegate AfzaliApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Health and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0468
    (SB0097 / CH0348)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0773 / CH0630
    (SB1008)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 630Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0827 / CH0124Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - NotificationDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0857Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1128 / CH0501Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1331Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate OaksIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1364
    (SB1039)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1367
    (SB0970)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1422
    (SB0739)
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1619
    (SB0505 / CH0394)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace ProgramDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0152Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for IntoxicationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0302
    (HB0864)
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0505 / CH0394
    (HB1619)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0546Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of RestrictionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0739
    (HB1422)
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0856 / CH0440
    (HB0180 / CH0441)
Public Health - HIV Testing During PregnancySenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0926 / CH0450
    (HB0399 / CH0451)
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required NoticeSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0945 / CH0512
    (HB1342)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Senator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0970
    (HB1367)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1008
    (HB0773 / CH0630)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1039
    (HB1364)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.