Chemical Tests

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133 / CH0378Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead LevelChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0164Environment - Lynch Cove Run - Soil TestingDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0255 / CH0159
    (SB0349 / CH0158)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0270 / CH0386Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic SchoolsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0489Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0919 / CH0679)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0860 / CH0793
    (SB0853 / CH0792)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Delegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0876
    (SB0918)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1010Health - Certified Recovery Residences - Urine TestingDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1068
    (SB0972)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1076Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - AnalysisDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1141
    (SB1094)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1209
    (SB0734 / CH0659)
Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017Delegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Budget and Taxation
Judicial Proceedings
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1375 / CH0486
    (SB0781 / CH0485)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CDelegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1404Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices StudyDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1428Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2017 - 9:30 a.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1625
    (SB1195)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0349 / CH0158
    (HB0255 / CH0159)
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and NotificationSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0692Drug or Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - RequirementsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0734 / CH0659
    (HB1209)
Sexual Assault Victims Resources Act of 2017Senator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 659Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0781 / CH0485
    (HB1375 / CH0486)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0853 / CH0792
    (HB0860 / CH0793)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0918
    (HB0876)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0919 / CH0679
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0972
    (HB1068)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0974Vehicle Laws - Driving With Detectable Levels of a Controlled Dangerous Substance or Its Metabolites - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1094
    (HB1141)
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - RequirementsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1195
    (HB1625)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.