Chesapeake Bay

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0385 / CH0435
    (SB0027 / CH0434)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0800
    (SB0524 / CH0492)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0837Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and ExpensesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0993Natural Resources - Public Waters - Public Right to Use and EnjoyDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0996
    (SB0895)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef InitiativeDelegate RudolphIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1208Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available TechnologySenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1244
    (SB0795)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1505 / CH0689
    (SB1032)
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time PeriodDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 689Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0027 / CH0434
    (HB0385 / CH0435)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0093Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third SpanSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/23/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0302 / CH0222Environment - Water Pollution Control - ReportingSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0500Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nitrogen Removal Technology - ProhibitionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0524 / CH0492
    (HB0800)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0748 / CH0314
    (HB0561 / CH0315)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting ApplicabilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0795
    (HB1244)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0895
    (HB0996)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef InitiativeSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0979Environment - Watershed Implementation Plan - Conowingo Dam Environmental AssessmentSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1008Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial ReviewSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1032
    (HB1505 / CH0689)
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time PeriodSenator ColburnIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.