Chesapeake Bay

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0080Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized UsesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0012 / CH0379Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local EntitiesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0058 / CH0380
    (SB0073)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0121
    (SB0062 / CH0010)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsDelegate Robinson, S.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0129 / CH0085
    (SB0407)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0162
    (SB0172 / CH0464)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0618
    (SB0437)
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration SurchargeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0905
    (SB0725)
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share ActDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Agriculture (M4)
HB0910Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required StudiesDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1155
    (SB0466)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1263Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0001Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available TechnologySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0062 / CH0010
    (HB0121)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0073
    (HB0058 / CH0380)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsSenator ColburnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0407
    (HB0129 / CH0085)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0437
    (HB0618)
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration SurchargeSenator FroshIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0466
    (HB1155)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0591Chesapeake Bay Striped Bass Fishery - Allocation of Commercial QuotaSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0609Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home ParkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0725
    (HB0905)
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0902Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.