Chesapeake Bay

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0068 / CH0461Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart RecipientsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0129BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - RenamingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0281
    (SB0266)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - ProhibitionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0384 / CH0369
    (SB0343 / CH0368)
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - ExpansionDelegate AdamsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0885Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge AreasDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0907
    (SB0850)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0924 / CH0027Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited ActionsDelegate GilchristEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1339
    (SB0554)
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh SizeDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HJ0010
    (SJ0008 / JR0004)
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission RequestDelegate BarveIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsRules and Executive Nominations
4/8/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0266
    (HB0281)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen RemovalSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0343 / CH0368
    (HB0384 / CH0369)
Bay Restoration Fund - Eligible Costs - ExpansionSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0554
    (HB1339)
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh SizeSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0850
    (HB0907)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1067Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SJ0008 / JR0004
    (HJ0010)
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission RequestSenator PinskySigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/8/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.