Child Abuse and Neglect

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0428 / CH0114Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate Kelly, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0631 / CH0380
    (SB0534)
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or NeglectDelegate HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0876Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task ForceDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0897
    (SB0570)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1186Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate McComasIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0094Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task ForceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0534
    (HB0631 / CH0380)
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or NeglectSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0570
    (HB0897)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.