Child Abuse and Neglect

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0359Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental InjuryDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0389Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - PenaltyDelegate SanchezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0473Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to ReportDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0508Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0632 / CH0152
    (SB0308 / CH0151)
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0641Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of DamagesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0642 / CH0012
    (SB0505)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsDelegate Wilson, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0697
    (SB0945)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0937Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0968Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and SignageDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1197
    (SB0797)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1198
    (SB0679)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1220Prince George's County - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor PG 313-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1263
    (SB0996)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - DefinitionsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1297Domestic Violence - Petitioner - Attorney for ChildDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1321Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1326Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0027Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0135Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to ReportSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0308 / CH0151
    (HB0632 / CH0152)
Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0368Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0505
    (HB0642 / CH0012)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0679
    (HB1198)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0797
    (HB1197)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)
SB0945
    (HB0697)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Judicial Proceedings
Family Law (D4)
SB0996
    (HB1263)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - DefinitionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:44 P.M.