Child Abuse and Neglect

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental InjuryDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0211Prince George's County Board of Education - Teachers and Administrators - Child Protective Services Investigation Findings PG 510-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0247 / CH0422
    (SB0963)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0454
    (SB0490 / CH0497)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationDelegate MoonIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0500
    (SB0132)
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to ReportDelegate SanchezIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0600
    (SB0131)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingDelegate McComasIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0838
    (SB0584)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1032
    (SB0684)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1072 / CH0031Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Instruction and TrainingDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1304Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1386 / CH0032Public Schools – Reporting Child Abuse – Telephone NumberDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1464Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1494
    (SB0964)
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot ProgramDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1507Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of NeglectDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1571Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1582 / CH0407Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring ProgramDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1744 / CH0410Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - ReportingDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1798County Boards of Education - Home Instruction Program - Observation of Instruction and Reporting of Abuse and NeglectDelegate TurnerIn the House - Rereferred to Ways and MeansWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0091 / CH0669Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0131
    (HB0600)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0132
    (HB0500)
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to ReportSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0412Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services OversightSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0490 / CH0497
    (HB0454)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0584
    (HB0838)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0684
    (HB1032)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0963
    (HB0247 / CH0422)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0964
    (HB1494)
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and ReportsSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.