Child Custody

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010
    (SB0052)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0687 / CH0633Commission on Child Custody Decision MakingDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0715
    (SB0620)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0872Family Law - Modification of Child Custody or Denial of Visitation - Expedited HearingsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0052
    (HB0010)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0620
    (HB0715)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.