Child Custody

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0068
    (SB0444)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0315 / CH0096
    (SB0396)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Judiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0760Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations LawsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0958
    (SB0411)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1007Family Law - Grandparent VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1278Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor ChildDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1301Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation DeterminationsDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1321Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and RegistrationDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1440
    (SB1004)
Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting TimeDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1533Commission on Child Custody Decision Making - ExtensionDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0144 / CH0039Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0363Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement AgreementSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0396
    (HB0315 / CH0096)
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or GuardianshipSenator Jones-RodwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0411
    (HB0958)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0444
    (HB0068)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1004
    (HB1440)
Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting TimeSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.