Child Custody

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1032
    (SB0684)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1034Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service MemberDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1464Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1507Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of NeglectDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB0308 / CH0380
    (HB0431 / CH0379)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0684
    (HB1032)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1238Family Law - Grandparent VisitationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 3:30 P.M.