Chiropractors

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0401 / CH0598
    (SB0381)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1156
    (SB0817)
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Practice of Chiropractic or Massage Therapy - Penalties and ExemptionsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations Health Occupations (J2)
HB1157 / CH0643Health Occupations - Massage Therapy - Authority to PracticeDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0381
    (HB0401 / CH0598)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0817
    (HB1156)
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Practice of Chiropractic or Massage Therapy - Penalties and ExemptionsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.