Churches

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0134
    (SB0233)
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - 46th District - Class B Location Restrictions - Limited ExemptionDelegate McHaleIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0168
    (SB0716)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly United Methodist Church Kitchen and Public Accessibility ProjectDelegate IveyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0175
    (SB0314)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0310
    (SB0430)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0365 / CH0616Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0491 / CH0120Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0645 / CH0128Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance from Schools, Places of Worship, or Youth Centers MC 16-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1021
    (SB0910)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1070 / CH0144Alcoholic Beverages - City of College Park - Sales by License Holders Near School Buildings PG 309-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 144Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1072 / CH0663Alcoholic Beverages - City of Laurel - Sales by License Holders PG 308-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1075
    (SB0657)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthorityDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1180
    (SB0892)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - New Creation Christian Academy Day Care PlaygroundDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1403
    (SB0635)
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry RestrictionsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1446
    (SB0529)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1482 / CH0601
    (SB1031 / CH0600)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsDelegate CaneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 601Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0036Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0233
    (HB0134)
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - 46th District - Class B Location Restrictions - Limited ExemptionSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0314
    (HB0175)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0430
    (HB0310)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0445Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and LimitationsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0471 / CH0277Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0529
    (HB1446)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0635
    (HB1403)
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry RestrictionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0657
    (HB1075)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthoritySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0716
    (HB0168)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly United Methodist Church Kitchen and Public Accessibility ProjectSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0892
    (HB1180)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - New Creation Christian Academy Day Care PlaygroundSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0910
    (HB1021)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB1031 / CH0600
    (HB1482 / CH0601)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 600Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.