Cigarettes

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0147Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0182 / CH0086
    (SB0098)
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette SubwholesalersDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0683
    (SB0700)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0684Tobacco-Free Schools ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1068
    (SB0425)
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale MarkupDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0069 / CH0174Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and PenaltiesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0098
    (HB0182 / CH0086)
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette SubwholesalersSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0425
    (HB1068)
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale MarkupSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0700
    (HB0683)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.