Cigarettes

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0278Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0405Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - ProhibitedDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0443
    (SB0589)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1070Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - ReportDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1159 / CH0447Cigarettes - County Retail License Holder - Prohibited SalesDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1208
    (SB0866)
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary OptionsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1291Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1334Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1408Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - FundingDelegate WoodIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0288Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - ProhibitionSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0325Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0589
    (HB0443)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0735Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0866
    (HB1208)
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary OptionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.