Cigarettes

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0071
    (SB0514)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0775Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0861Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and TaxationDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1115 / CH0732Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16Montgomery County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732Economic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1618
    (SB1144)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Health and Government Operations
3/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0114Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil EnforcementChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0514
    (HB0071)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB1144
    (HB1618)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.