Cigarettes

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0354
    (SB0624)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0541
    (SB0474)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesDelegate HayesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0474
    (HB0541)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0624
    (HB0354)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0669Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil FinesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.