Citations

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0086Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensed Establishments - Sales to MinorsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0104Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty ForgivenessDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0166Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0190District Court Electronic Citation Fund and FeeDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0336
    (SB0009)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0352State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation AuthorityChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0435Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0727Criminal Defendants - Citations - TheftDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0742 / CH0386
    (SB0991)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthorityDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0966
    (SB0788)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1094Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1251Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales ProhibitionDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1465Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0009
    (HB0336)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0389Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0788
    (HB0966)
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion PracticesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0991
    (HB0742 / CH0386)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthoritySenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.