Citations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0024Natural Resources - Forest, Park, and Wildlife Rangers - Parking CitationsDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0263 / CH0683School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification RequirementDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 683Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
HB0380
    (SB0937)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0408
    (SB0477)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0488
    (SB0798)
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantityDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0495
    (SB0154 / CH0744)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0781 / CH0343Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement RevisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1185
    (SB0928)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1510Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0081Interstate Boating Violator CompactSenator SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0136Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political SubdivisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0154 / CH0744
    (HB0495)
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltySenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0477
    (HB0408)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0798
    (HB0488)
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis QuantitySenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0928
    (HB1185)
Criminal Law - Cannabis - LegalizationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0937
    (HB0380)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerSenator SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judiciary
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Gaming (C7)
SB0946Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1033 / CH0617
    (HB0702)
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:39 A.M.