Civil Rights Commission

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0172
    (SB0728)
Home Act of 2017Delegate LaffertyIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0254State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without RequestDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0367Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0696
    (SB0849)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1175
    (SB0834)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1208
    (SB0616)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0616
    (HB1208)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0728
    (HB0172)
Home Act of 2017Senator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0834
    (HB1175)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0849
    (HB0696)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0971
    (HB0919)
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting DiscriminationSenator KaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)

April 11, 2017 12:09 P.M.