Clerks of Court

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0046Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0404 / CH0425
    (SB0234)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0484
    (SB0861)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0523 / CH0814
    (SB0119)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - LicensingDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0799Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0864
    (SB1047)
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony FeesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0939
    (SB0747)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0941 / CH0410
    (SB0631)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1191
    (SB0378)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0002 / CH0512Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary MapsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0119
    (HB0523 / CH0814)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - LicensingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0234
    (HB0404 / CH0425)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0376 / CH0521
    (HB0595 / CH0520)
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to RecordingSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0378
    (HB1191)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0631
    (HB0941 / CH0410)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0747
    (HB0939)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0861
    (HB0484)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator SmithIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0922Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - ApplicantsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1047
    (HB0864)
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony FeesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.