Clinics

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0105Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid CenterDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0312 / CH0457
    (SB0334 / CH0456)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1116
    (SB0509)
Cosmetic Surgery - RegulationDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1237
    (SB0139 / CH0184)
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation InsuranceDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0139 / CH0184
    (HB1237)
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation InsuranceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0334 / CH0456
    (HB0312 / CH0457)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0509
    (HB1116)
Cosmetic Surgery - RegulationSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0693Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice PrivilegesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.