Codes

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0469
    (SB0018)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Delegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1084 / CH0323
    (SB0797 / CH0322)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Economic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0018
    (HB0469)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0797 / CH0322
    (HB1084 / CH0323)
Thermal Energy - Task Force and RegulationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.