Codes

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0203
    (SB0852)
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - ApplicabilityDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0207 / CH0050
    (SB0140 / CH0049)
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0405
    (SB0461)
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - QualificationsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0412
    (SB0789)
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6Delegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0140 / CH0049
    (HB0207 / CH0050)
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0461
    (HB0405)
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - QualificationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0789
    (HB0412)
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6Senator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0852
    (HB0203)
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - ApplicabilitySenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:38 P.M.