Collective Bargaining

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0015Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and NegotiationDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0083
    (SB0073 / CH0647)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0163University of Maryland University College - Collective Bargaining - Adjunct FacultyDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0199
    (SB0560)
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0264Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0278 / CH0127Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0284 / CH0607
    (SB0636)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0451 / CH0814
    (SB0655)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate JacksonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0512
    (SB0377)
Labor and Employment - Wage History InformationDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0667
    (SB0408)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0808Education – Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees – Supervisory Employees and Management PersonnelDelegate TarlauVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0811 / CH0022
    (SB0819 / CH0029)
Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee ProcessingDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0864 / CH0023
    (SB0654 / CH0026)
Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - ContinuationDelegate Miller, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0971Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement AllowanceDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1017 / CH0024
    (SB0677 / CH0027)
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee ProgramDelegate KormanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1105Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath TestsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1220Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of NegotiationsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1571Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1740
    (SB1179)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1741Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Recommendations of Fact FinderDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0073 / CH0647
    (HB0083)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0408
    (HB0667)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHigher Education (F2)
SB0560
    (HB0199)
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0636
    (HB0284 / CH0607)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0654 / CH0026
    (HB0864 / CH0023)
Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - ContinuationSenator MathiasEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0655
    (HB0451 / CH0814)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0677 / CH0027
    (HB1017 / CH0024)
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee ProgramSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0819 / CH0029
    (HB0811 / CH0022)
Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee ProcessingSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1179
    (HB1740)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1204Baltimore City - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps InstructorsSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 12:59 P.M.