Commerce, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0161Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RestructuringChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0245 / CH0259Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and RestructuringChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0349 / CH0181
    (SB0807 / CH0180)
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1007
    (SB0364)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1052
    (SB0873 / CH0489)
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - AlterationDelegate WalkerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1070Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - StudyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1378Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Building a Maryland Inclusive Maritime FacilityDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1464 / CH0846Make Office Vacancies Extinct ProgramDelegate WaldstreicherEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1586
    (SB1019)
Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance StudyDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0364
    (HB1007)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0465 / CH0629
    (HB1517)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0796Economic Development - County Economic Development Tax Incentives Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0807 / CH0180
    (HB0349 / CH0181)
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)Senator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0873 / CH0489
    (HB1052)
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - AlterationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0971
    (HB0919)
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting DiscriminationSenator KaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1019
    (HB1586)
Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance StudySenator CassillyIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1142Income Tax - Corporate Headquarters Investment and Job Retention Tax CreditSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.