Commerce, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0099
    (SB0134 / CH0571)
Small Business Relief Tax CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0363
    (SB0305)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0364
    (SB0310)
CyberMaryland Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0521Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Small Business Set-AsideDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0526Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0527 / CH0364Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - AlterationsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0616
    (SB0020)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film EntitiesDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0850Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box SpringsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0860Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan PaymentsDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0989
    (SB0877 / CH0350)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1295 / CH0584
    (SB0989 / CH0583)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and AlterationDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1370
    (SB0956)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - EstablishmentDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1449
    (SB1154 / CH0595)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - AlterationsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1450Income Tax - Research and Development Tax Credit - AlterationsDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1542 / CH0795Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – StudyDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 795Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1621Department of Commerce - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact StudyDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1763Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Approval of Applications - Competitive Award ProcessDelegate TarlauIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0020
    (HB0616)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film EntitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0134 / CH0571
    (HB0099)
Small Business Relief Tax CreditPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0228 / CH0578Cybersecurity Incentive Tax CreditsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0305
    (HB0363)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0310
    (HB0364)
CyberMaryland Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0414 / CH0455Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data CollectionSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0420Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0563 / CH0609Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim CreditSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0877 / CH0350
    (HB0989)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0955Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0956
    (HB1370)
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - EstablishmentSenator EckardtIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0966RISE Zones - Expansion and Income Tax CreditSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0989 / CH0583
    (HB1295 / CH0584)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and AlterationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1151Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - AlterationSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1154 / CH0595
    (HB1449)
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – AlterationsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:44 A.M.