Commercial Rehabilitation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1028
    (SB0919)
Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – Port Discovery Children’s MuseumDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1286 / CH0839
    (SB0614 / CH0840)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessDelegate GlennEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1454 / CH0842
    (SB0967 / CH0843)
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable HousingDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0469Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0614 / CH0840
    (HB1286 / CH0839)
State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and ProcessSenator RobinsonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0918Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Federal Hill Streetscape ImprovementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0919
    (HB1028)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Port Discovery Children's MuseumSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0967 / CH0843
    (HB1454 / CH0842)
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable HousingSenator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.