Community Colleges

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory ProvisionsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0052
    (SB0704)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0266
    (SB0146)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB0290
    (SB0147)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0415
    (SB0187)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Community College of Baltimore County Catonsville Historic Mansion PreservationDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0557
    (SB0607)
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial InformationDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013Delegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0871Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County TuitionDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0928Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition WaiverDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0964 / CH0658
    (SB0410)
Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages ProgramsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB1418Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting RequirementDelegate BranchIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0146
    (HB0266)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0147
    (HB0290)
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0187
    (HB0415)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Catonsville Historic Hilton Mansion RehabilitationSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0410
    (HB0964 / CH0658)
Community Colleges - Cade Funding Formula - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages ProgramsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0480Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility PropertySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0704
    (HB0052)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0838Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy ProtectionSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0841 / CH0428
    (HB0863)
Higher Education Fair Share ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SJ0001International Education - SupportSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.