Community Colleges

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Task Force to Improve Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers Scores for Maryland Public School StudentsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0204Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0426 / CH0589
    (SB0311 / CH0588)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0507Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - ProhibitionDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0623
    (SB0959)
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License ProgramsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0763Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Public Senior Higher Education Institution - Payment of County Minimum WageDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0798
    (SB0596)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Community College of Baltimore County Catonsville Campus Artificial Turf FieldDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0848
    (SB0678)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0868
    (SB0869)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0871
    (SB0652)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0900Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community CollegeDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0931Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1069
    (SB0152)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - FundingDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1250Higher Education - Student Employees - Collective BargainingDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1508
    (SB1000)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1587
    (SB0117 / CH0691)
Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State ResidentsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1595 / CH0847
    (SB1127 / CH0848)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847Appropriations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1608
    (SB1131)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesDelegate OttoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0100Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Studies CenterSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0117 / CH0691
    (HB1587)
Community Colleges - Out-of-State Fee - Waiver for Border State ResidentsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 691Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0152
    (HB1069)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - FundingSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0521 / CH0330Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0596
    (HB0798)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Community College of Baltimore County Catonsville Campus Artificial Turf FieldSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0652
    (HB0871)
Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0678
    (HB0848)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0869
    (HB0868)
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and ScholarshipsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0959
    (HB0623)
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Reimbursement of Certificate and License ProgramsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1000
    (HB1508)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1127 / CH0848
    (HB1595 / CH0847)
Baltimore City Community College - RealignmentSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1131
    (HB1608)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB1173Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.