Community Development

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0275Department of Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Community Investment Tax CreditChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0278
    (SB0415)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0326 / CH0482Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood RevitalizationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0337Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization DistrictsDelegate LongIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0446 / CH0620
    (SB0103)
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - RevisionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 620Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0686 / CH0030
    (SB0559)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HammenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0939
    (SB0759 / CH0578)
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit - Alteration and ExtensionDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1198 / CH0304Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1400 / CH0031
    (SB1172)
Seed Community Development Anchor Institution FundDelegate GlennEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1507
    (SB0974)
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - EligibilityDelegate McCrayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0103
    (HB0446 / CH0620)
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0415
    (HB0278)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0559
    (HB0686 / CH0030)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0759 / CH0578
    (HB0939)
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alteration and ExtensionSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0974
    (HB1507)
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - EligibilitySenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1172
    (HB1400 / CH0031)
Seed Community Development Anchor Institution FundSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.