Communications

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0116 / CH0039
    (SB0267 / CH0038)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1271Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or LikenessDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0267 / CH0038
    (HB0116 / CH0039)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1056Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - DisclosureSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.