Communications

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0620State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0808
    (SB0660)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0824 / CH0823
    (SB0548 / CH0824)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB0898 / CH0852Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1082 / CH0573
    (SB1060 / CH0574)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1165Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family RelationshipsDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1169 / CH0620
    (SB0717 / CH0621)
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017Delegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 620Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1273 / CH0726
    (SB0997)
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological ProductsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 726Health and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1292State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1498 / CH0851Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and DisclosureDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1518Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0008 / CH0036Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment ActChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0130 / CH0282Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign PrincipalsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0660
    (HB0808)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0717 / CH0621
    (HB1169 / CH0620)
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017Senator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0997
    (HB1273 / CH0726)
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological ProductsSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1106 / CH0610
    (HB0352)
Health Care Practitioners - Use of TeletherapySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.