Commuters

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1010Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1012 / CH0289Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit AmountDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1338Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 CorridorDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1439Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1607
    (SB1052 / CH0025)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0275
    (HB0092)
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0655Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll ExpensesSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Senator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.