Commuters

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0372
    (SB0277)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1227Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - AlterationsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1317Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll ExpensesDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1332Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter PlanDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1468Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) ProgramDelegate BeidleIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0277
    (HB0372)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0743
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

April 16, 2018 4:37 P.M.