Condemnation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0548
    (SB1073)
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - RequirementsDelegate HealeyIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0773
    (SB0695)
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission ApprovalDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0784Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice RequirementsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0812
    (SB0691)
Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved LandDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1079Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationPublic Safety (E4)
HB1199Northern Bay CrossingDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1363State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of TransportationDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0691
    (HB0812)
Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved LandSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0695
    (HB0773)
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission ApprovalSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1003Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - LimitationsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1073
    (HB0548)
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - ApplicationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

April 11, 2018 2:49 P.M.