Condominiums

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0128Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or ManagerDelegate JacksonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0538Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure SaleDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0545Landlord and Tenant - Water and Wastewater Charges - Billing SystemsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0970 / CH0566
    (SB0591 / CH0565)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1061Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - RegistrationDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1080Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Governing DocumentsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1127 / CH0298Prince George's County - Dissemination of Voter Information Material - Multifamily Residential Structures PG 408-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1170
    (SB0250)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1192 / CH0735
    (SB0816)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1377Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureDelegate ParrottIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1452
    (SB0902)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0168Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0250
    (HB1170)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0591 / CH0565
    (HB0970 / CH0566)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0816
    (HB1192 / CH0735)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0902
    (HB1452)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.