Congress, U.S.

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0962Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HJ0005Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964Delegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate GainesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HJ0007United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0008Establishment of a Presidential Youth CouncilDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HJ0009The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care ActDelegate MoonIn the House - Returned PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0002
    (HJ0002)
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0003United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0007Protection of the Federal Affordable Care ActSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

April 10, 2017 9:32 P.M.