Conservation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - UsesDelegate VitaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0378 / CH0108Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - ReimbursementDelegate StocksdaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0385 / CH0435
    (SB0027 / CH0434)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0623Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management PracticesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Chair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0936 / CH0655Natural Resources - Maryland Botanical Heritage WorkgroupDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0996
    (SB0895)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef InitiativeDelegate RudolphIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1025
    (SB0564)
Frederick County - Forest Conservation Act - Application to Public School PropertyFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1091
    (SB0796)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate JamesonIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1143Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation CommissionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1241
    (SB0525)
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement FundDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1282Agricultural Land Condemnation BoardDelegate EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1295Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1352State Government - Commemorative Days - Earth HourDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1489
    (SB0935)
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction FinancingDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0027 / CH0434
    (HB0385 / CH0435)
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding ExtensionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0457Calvert County - Local Forest Conservation Fund - Administrative CostsCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0525
    (HB1241)
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement FundSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0564
    (HB1025)
Frederick County - Forest Conservation Act - Application to Public School PropertySenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0575 / CH0502Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual ReportSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0702 / CH0529
    (HB1337 / CH0530)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0796
    (HB1091)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Agriculture (M4)
SB0839General Assembly and Department of Legislative Services - Reduction in Paper UseSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0895
    (HB0996)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef InitiativeSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0935
    (HB1489)
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction FinancingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0961 / CH0078Horse Racing - Special TakeoutSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.