Conservation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0058 / CH0380
    (SB0073)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0069Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0361State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council StandardsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0789
    (SB0709)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0861
    (SB0259 / CH0287)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Agriculture (M4)
HB1028Prince George's County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Report on County Funding Plan PG 417-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1165 / CH0349
    (SB0875 / CH0348)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1437Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial HardshipDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1463
    (SB1020)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0071 / CH0012Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of EasementChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0073
    (HB0058 / CH0380)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsSenator ColburnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0135Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - MoratoriumSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0259 / CH0287
    (HB0861)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters Agriculture (M4)
SB0359Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - DefinitionSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0709
    (HB0789)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator DysonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0875 / CH0348
    (HB1165 / CH0349)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1020
    (HB1463)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.