Conservation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0002
    (SB0615)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0156
    (SB0133 / CH0153)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0169
    (SB0211)
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council StandardsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0336Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0635
    (SB0032)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education CenterDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0032
    (HB0635)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education CenterSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0133 / CH0153
    (HB0156)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0211
    (HB0169)
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council StandardsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0600 / CH0370Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - FundingSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0615
    (HB0002)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0826Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy AdministrationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.