Conservation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043 / CH0303Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0067 / CH0343Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or InstallationDelegate Lewis, J.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0198 / CH0293Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – ExemptionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0396
    (SB0354)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0609 / CH0089
    (SB0360)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0620 / CH0294County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - ExtensionsDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0727 / CH0743State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine MuseumCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 743Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0766
    (SB0610)
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic ReviewDelegate HealeyIn the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1120Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism ActivitiesDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1229 / CH0066Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1345Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV AreasDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1351 / CH0492Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion EventsDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1440Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance FeeDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1736
    (SB1140 / CH0623)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot ReleaseDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAgriculture (M4)
SB0026State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - MergerChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0354
    (HB0396)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0360
    (HB0609 / CH0089)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0610
    (HB0766)
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset PolicySenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0997Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1140 / CH0623
    (HB1736)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of ChildSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1235Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit TransferSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.