Constitutional Amendments

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0176Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0307General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0347
    (SB0294)
Government Accountability Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0513Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0532 / CH0855
    (SB0594)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling PlaceDelegate ReznikAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0607Circuit Court Judges - Selection and TenureDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0731General Assembly - Length of SessionDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0761Courts - Aggravated Murder CourtDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0770Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as PredecessorDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0886General Assembly - Term LimitsDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1014Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports WageringDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1022Congressional Districts - StandardsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1264
    (SB1039)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1328General Assembly - Establishment of House Districts (Maryland Fair Representation Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1361Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1362House Legislative Districts - Single MemberDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1363State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of TransportationDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1648
    (SB1035)
Declaration of Rights – Access to InformationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1697
    (SB1122 / CH0357)
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional AmendmentDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1779Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HJ0004United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits AmendmentDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0294
    (HB0347)
Government Accountability Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0594
    (HB0532 / CH0855)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling PlaceSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0820State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0873Constitutional Amendment - Right to Healthy Environment and CommunitiesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1029Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - RestrictionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1035
    (HB1648)
Declaration of Rights - Right to InformationSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1039
    (HB1264)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1122 / CH0357
    (HB1697)
Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional AmendmentSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.